Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Rodolfo J Miro, against Bun, Heng, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with GRUBE, KARL B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRUBE, KARL B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: $282.00 COST; VER: F; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
June 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
June 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
June 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT $4165.01 PRIN $1125.13 INOR14411PG0973-001; VER: N; P Vol./Book 14411, Page 0973, 001 pages
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
June 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT NONCOMPLIANCE COURT APPROVED STIPULATION; VER: F; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 044 FROM SECTION 045 BY 5347 - MANUAL E; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: - CLAIM, COST, INTEREST 041105; VER: F; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF Comment: DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF; VER: N; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.