Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Segura, Magaly, Pro Medical And Rehabilitation Center Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by R Stanley Gipe, Esq, against Mercury Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by George Hunter, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcNARY, MYRA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 047 FROM SECTION NPC BY 8461 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; VER: F; D
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MOTION INVOKE FLORIDA RULES CIVIL PROCEDURE; VER: F; D
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Comment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: F; D
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM Comment: NOTICE/SERVICE/PROCESS INS COMM 3/8; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 4/26 @ 11:00 J/MCNARY; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ INSURANCE COMMISSIONER; VER: N; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $55.00; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.