Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barnes, Christopher L, Barnes, Cynthia L, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rebecca S Sinclair, against Bray, Erica, Smith, Tracy, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT OR15455PG1706-002; VER: R; P Vol./Book 15455, Page 1706, 002 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: R; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14751PG0953-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14751, Page 0953, 002 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED ON BOTH DEFENDANTS; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.