Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Edwards, Elizabeth Amelia, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against Edwards, Bryan David, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2007 |
CategoryIv-D Administrative Support |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION (9:30 AM) (Magistrate FLANNERY, JOSEPH) Terminate Child Support
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE RE-OPEN FEE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TERMINATE CHILD SUPPORT - PRO SE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SCREEN; VER: F; K
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE Comment: FINDINGS/ORDER OF COURT RE: REINSTATING SUPPORT; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT Comment: ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; K
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER Comment: INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H)
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR PCL ON 072211 AT 10:30; VER: N; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.