Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jennings, Joyce Lynn, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Jennings, Paul E, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction Without Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION (SRS DISPO) Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR14117PG1987-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14117, Page 1987, 001 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer WILLIAMS, AMY M)
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF TEMP INJ; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comment: MOTION DISMISS PRO SE; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR 020905 10:00; VER: N; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION W/O NOTICE 020905; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF Comment: 3 C/C PETITION W/ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET Comment: CLERKS INFORMATION SHEET; VER: F; K
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.