Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bailey Family Trust B, Bailey, Harold S, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by David Luczak, against All Other Unknown Occupants, Irwin, Ines, represented by Robert C Thompson, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
COURT WORKSHEET Comment: COURT WORKSHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL; VER: F; D
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
NON-JURY TRIAL Comment: NON JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION /ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL 022805 AT 1:00; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 022805 1:00; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: INES IRWIN PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED INES IRWIN 020105; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.