Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deyong, Arthur, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by W Thomas Frost, against Counts, James, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: R; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: NOT ENOUGH MONEY IN ACCT; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
FACT INFORMATION SHEET Comment: FACT INFORMATION SHEET (BLANK); VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: $188.75 COST; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT $2089.10 PRIN $182.80 INTOR14425PG0024-002; VER: N; P Vol./Book 14425, Page 0024, 002 pages
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF Comment: DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF; VER: N; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.