Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lucito, Tim, Lucito, Sonya, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Manuel N Lindiakos, Esq, against Outback Steakhouse Of Florida Inc, represented by Ann Ohern, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR14864PG2266-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14864, Page 2266, 001 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - IMPASSE; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL); VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPO Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED (4); VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.