Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sal Abbate Dvm Pa, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Louis Bakkalapulo, Esq, against Bayer Healthcare Llc, represented by Melissa Zinkis, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 011609; VER: F; D
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR16485PG2163-002; VER: F; D Vol./Book 16485, Page 2163, 002 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: F; D
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISAL OF ACTION W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 121008; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 091708; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.