Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ameriquest Mortgage Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Amy Post, against St Petersburg City Of Florida, Pinellas County Florida, Mcleod, Ronald, Mcleer, Debbie, represented by Richard B Badgley, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Copy Of Receipt-Returned Orig Note Comment: COPY OF RECEIPT/RETURNED ORIG NOTE; VER: F; K
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING Comment: ORDER VACATING: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14517PG0189-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14517, Page 0189, 002 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/DISMISS COMPLAINT/; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: TO DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/DISMISS COMPLAINT ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 080505; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED BANKRUPTCY Comment: FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED: PER JDGE LENDERMAN REIN (KMB); VER: N; K
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.