Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Green, Clifford, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case represented by Edward T Culbertson, against Scott, Michael, Sr, Scott, Michael, Jr, represented by Robert D Carreiro, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2005 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER PARTITION OR15236PG1701-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15236, Page 1701, 001 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR PARTITION SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 062806 10:00; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 061306 AT 2:00; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.