Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Professional Staffing A B T S Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Reeves Builders Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT Comment: AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 048 FROM SECTION NPC BY 1953 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT Comment: NOTICE PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMT 031405; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (11:00 AM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $255.00; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ PRO SE MAIL; VER: N; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.