Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dixit, Chandra, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kevin M Lougachi, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; VER: N; P | |
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | WITH PREJUDICEComment: WITH PREJUDICE OR15797PG1171-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 15797, Page 1171, 001 pages | |
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWALComment: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; VER: F; P | |
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | AMENDEDComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED ATTYS LIEN; VER: F; P | |
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P | |
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWComment: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; VER: F; P | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED COPY ATTORNEY LIEN FOR FEES/COSTS; VER: F; P | |
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTComment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.