Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mccafferty, Bryan, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Christopher R Pavlik, against Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Pacific Cycle Inc, represented by Joseph R Flood, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASE, JAMES R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTCHED NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO DISTRICT COURT; VER: F; D | |
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE; VER: N; D | |
January 20, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCEComment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL; VER: F; D | |
January 20, 2005 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALComment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P | |
January 20, 2005 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISSComment: MOTION DISMISS; VER: F; D | |
January 20, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINTComment: AMENDED COMPLAINT; VER: F; P | |
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPYComment: CERTIFIED COPY -MLD NON-PARTY 1/14/04; VER: N; K | |
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED WAL-MART STORES INC 122804; VER: F; K | |
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED PACIFIC CYCLE INC 122804; VER: F; K | |
December 23, 2004 | Docket Event | THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTIONComment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 021 BY 2682 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.