Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leatham, Jennifer, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Christopher D Gray, against Tarpon Springs Yacht Club Incorporated Et Al, Lodovico, Samuel, represented by Robert A Gualtieri, Steven G Wenzel, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASE, JAMES R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR14898PG1687-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 14898, Page 1687, 001 pages | |
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO (SECOND); VER: F; P | |
October 20, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO; VER: F; P | |
September 02, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO OF JENNIFER LEATHAM (THIRD); VER: F; D | |
September 01, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS; VER: F; P | |
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO (THIRD); VER: F; D | |
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOComment: SECOND AMENDED CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO; VER: F; D | |
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO (SECOND); VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.