Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Costanzo, Maryann N, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by James D Arnold, Jr, against Sunset Square General Partnership, represented by Ralph L Marchbank, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEComment: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OR14910PG0621-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 14910, Page 0621, 001 pages | |
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO RETD SERVED; VER: F; D | |
October 21, 2005 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTComment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P | |
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P | |
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; P | |
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCEComment: AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE; VER: F; P | |
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 092905; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.