Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jackson, Seaton, Jackson, Dolores, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jacqueline M Swift-Bray, against Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc, Echevarria And Associates P A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W DOUGLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAIRD, W DOUGLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE; VER: F; P | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATEComment: CERTIFICATE OF NON-ATTENDANCE; VER: F; P | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 041107 AT 10:15; VER: F; P | |
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERComment: MOTION PROTECTIVE ORDER; VER: F; D | |
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P | |
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 041007 AT 10:00; VER: F; P | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTComment: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; D | |
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL /IMPASSE; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.