Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prindle, Marta, Prindle, Barry, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Thomas J Donnelly, Esq, against Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, represented by Melinda A Morris, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOWNEY, BRANDT C, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED; VER: F; D | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED (7); VER: F; D | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEComment: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OR15029PG1290-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 15029, Page 1290, 001 pages | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REComment: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE: PROPOSED ORDER; VER: F; D | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
March 28, 2006 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL --- SETTLED; VER: F; P | |
March 28, 2006 | Docket Event | STIP OF PARTIES (MEDIATION CONFERENCE)Comment: STIP OF PARTIES (MEDIATION CONFERENCE); VER: F; P | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 022806; VER: F; D | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.