Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wildwood Acre Ranch Trust, Douglas, James L, Sr, Douglas, Charlottetrustee, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Aubrey O Dicus Jr, Esq, against Tradition Global Clearing Inc, Strategic Lien Services Llc, Strategic Lien Acquisition Llc, Poiset, Matthew, Assentato, Emil, (total of 5) See All represented by Lee H Rightmyer, Esq, Robert W Clark, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES DONE 5/3/07 DJD; VER: N; K | |
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FORComment: REQUEST FOR: PAGE COUNT 10 PAGES SB DONE; VER: N; K | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 070606; VER: F; P | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 070606 2:00; VER: F; D | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON MOTN LEAVE FILE SECOND; VER: N; P | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINTComment: AMENDED COMPLAINT; VER: F; P | |
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGComment: ORDER GRANTING STIP FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.