Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lee, Eric, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Frank J Currie, Esq, against Carlisle Motors Llc, represented by Nicholas Francis Mooney, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLOGAN, WALTER D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2004 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTIONComment: MOTION PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MEDIATION; VER: F; D | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | EXHIBITComment: EXHIBIT FAX MOTION TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE MEDIATION-DENIED; VER: F; D | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGComment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY; VER: F; D | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 012706; VER: F; D | |
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; VER: F; D | |
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | DEPOSITION OFComment: DEPOSITION OF WILLIAM MITCHELL 121806; VER: F; D | |
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (VIDEO); VER: F; P | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (VIDEO); VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.