Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cit Group Equipment Financing Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Patrick W Skelton, against Industrial Technology And Fabrication Inc, Grubelic, Ivo, represented by Thomas C Little, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOWNEY, BRANDT C, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P | |
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event | CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDINGComment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR15077PG1608-001; VER: R; KVol./Book 15077, Page 1608, 001 pages | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIENComment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (SRS)Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTComment: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR15029PG1357-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 15029, Page 1357, 001 pages | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 033006 1:30; VER: F; P | |
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P | |
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTComment: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; P | |
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.