Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tullis George R Estate Of, Smith Barbara Pr, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Leslie A Goller, against Commons At Tyrone, represented by Glenn M Burton, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; VER: N; P | |
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 022706; VER: F; P | |
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | WITH PREJUDICEComment: WITH PREJUDICE OR14961PG1496-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 14961, Page 1496, 001 pages | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 010306; VER: F; D | |
December 14, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 010306 AT 4:15; VER: F; D | |
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TOComment: MEMORANDUM OPPOSITION TO: MOTION DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT; VER: F; P | |
November 04, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONSComment: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; D | |
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /TRIAL DAMAGE; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.