Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Violetis, Photios, Violetis, Nektarios, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paul S Reed, against Spencer, Angela Carlton, represented by Evelio L Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2004 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE DESTROYEDComment: PLTF & DEFT EVIDENCE DESTROYED; VER: N; K | |
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event | INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCEComment: INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE SENT TO DEFT ATTY (GARCIA); VER: F; K | |
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event | INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCEComment: INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE SENT TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCEComment: INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE SENT TO DEFT ATTY (NELSON); VER: F; K | |
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | TRIAL WEEK OFComment: TRIAL WEEK OF: 121106; VER: F; P | |
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE TRIAL-ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCEComment: NOTICE TRIAL/ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 112706 10:00; VER: N; P | |
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDERComment: AGREED ORDER: GRANTING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.