Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jl Technology Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Injunction - Circuit case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W DOUGLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAIRD, W DOUGLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2004 |
CategoryInjunction - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Pro Hac Vice Attorney FeeComment: PRO HAC VICE ATTORNEY FEE $100.00; VER: N; P | |
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONComment: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE; VER: F; P | |
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P | |
July 08, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGComment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; VER: F; P | |
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPTION OF PROCEEDINGSComment: TRANSCRIPTION OF PROCEEDINGS HEARING 080604; VER: F; P | |
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR14421PG0323-004; VER: F; DVol./Book 14421, Page 0323, 004 pages | |
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY; VER: F; D | |
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 051205; VER: F; P | |
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 070705 11:30; VER: F; P | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.