Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Arnel, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Wendolyn S Busch, against Southwest Medical Management Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFFER, SUSAN F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFFER, SUSAN F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P | |
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P | |
October 01, 2004 | Docket Event | Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $35.50; VER: N; P | |
September 30, 2004 | Docket Event | CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDINGComment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: N; K | |
September 28, 2004 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIENComment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P | |
September 20, 2004 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK REComment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RTN CK/LIEN/NEED ADD'L FEES; VER: F; K | |
September 14, 2004 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIENComment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P | |
August 16, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENTComment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR13773PG2331-004; VER: F; PVol./Book 13773, Page 2331, 004 pages | |
August 16, 2004 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P | |
August 11, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOComment: SUBPOENA FOR DEPO DUCES TECUM SERVED; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.