Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Yellow Pages Directory Service Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Paul R Cavonis, Esq, against Sterling Capital Trust Llc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $44.00; VER: N; P | |
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event | CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDINGComment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR15133PG1631-005; VER: R; KVol./Book 15133, Page 1631, 005 pages | |
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIENComment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P | |
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (SRS)Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P | |
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENTComment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR15095PG1877-005; VER: F; PVol./Book 15095, Page 1877, 005 pages | |
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 040406 11:00; VER: F; P | |
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 031006 2:30; VER: F; P | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONComment: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; VER: F; P | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES INCURRED; VER: F; P | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.