Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vincent, Doris, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dominic O Fariello, against Head, Adrian P, Amstar Insurance Company, represented by James B Thompson Jr, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2004 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR14162PG0264-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 14162, Page 0264, 001 pages | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
November 08, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D | |
October 25, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D | |
October 25, 2004 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D | |
October 13, 2004 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P | |
October 13, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P | |
October 04, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCEComment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; VER: F; P | |
October 04, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.