Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seibolt, Linda, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brian P Battaglia, Esq, against Liberty American Insurance Company, represented by James B Thompson Sr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLENDERMAN, JOHN C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; D | |
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; D | |
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 052505; VER: F; D | |
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event | JOINT STIP-ORDER Comment: JOINT STIP/ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR14352PG1968-002; VER: F; D Vol./Book 14352, Page 1968, 002 pages | |
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event | MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT Comment: MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT -SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P | |
March 03, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 031705 8:00; VER: F; P | |
February 11, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P | |
February 11, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER Comment: ORDER TO SET MEDIATION; VER: F; P | |
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 021005 9:00; VER: F; D | |
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO SET CAUSE FOR MEDIATION; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.