Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dupuis, Micahel, Sr, Dupuis, Andrea J, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Justin R Lumley, against Mcknight, William D Co-Trustee, Mcknight, Kathryn A Co-Trustee, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
August 23, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
August 23, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
August 16, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED WILLIAM D CO-TRUSTMCKNIGHT 071204; VER: F; K | |
August 16, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED KATHRYN A CO-TRUSTMCKNIGHT 071204; VER: F; K | |
August 04, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: KATHRYN A CO-TRUSTMCKNIGHT 071204; VER: F; K | |
August 04, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON; VER: N; K | |
June 24, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE AT OT CITGO/QUIK MA; VER: F; P | |
June 22, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: WILLIAM D MCKNIGHT CO-TRUSTEE OF WILLIAM D MCKNIGHT TRUST; VER: N; K | |
June 22, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: WILLIAM D MCKNIGHT CO-TRUSTEE OF KATHRYN A MCKNIGHT TRUST; VER: N; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.