Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Franklin Templeton Companies Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brian P Deeb, Esq, against York Heating And Air Conditioning Corporation, represented by James M Matulis, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McGRADY, J THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGRADY, J THOMAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; D | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; D | |
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED (3); VER: F; T | |
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONComment: OBJECTION /RESPONSE ON NON-PARTY TO SUBPOENA; VER: F; P | |
September 04, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 090208; VER: F; D | |
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE SUPP INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE SUPP INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; T | |
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; D | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 031608; VER: F; D | |
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D | |
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS TO EXPERT INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.