Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Braun, Peter, Braun, Miriam, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Scott M Whitley, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2004 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY; VER: F; D | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SECOND); VER: F; D | |
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SECOND); VER: F; P | |
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (VIDEO); VER: F; P | |
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTComment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P | |
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPELComment: MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF TO PRODUCE RECORDS; VER: F; D | |
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOComment: SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO (VIDEO); VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.