Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bliss, Lenny, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Eduardo R Latour, Esq, against Freedom Ford Inc, represented by Robert E Sickles, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOWNEY, BRANDT C, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; D | |
September 01, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCEComment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 112105 AT 10:00; VER: F; D | |
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OFComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF: PROCESS OF SUBPOENA; VER: F; P | |
August 10, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMMComment: NOTICE/SERVICE/PROCESS INS COMM NATIONWIDE MUT FIRE 080105; VER: F; P | |
July 22, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 072105; VER: F; D | |
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 062805; VER: F; D | |
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMMComment: NOTICE/SERVICE/PROCESS INS COMM OF; VER: N; P | |
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event | ID NAMEComment: NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 061505; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.