Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kogut, Harold, Kogut, Deanna, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by James J Dowling, against American States Preferred Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FARNELL, CROCKETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFARNELL, CROCKETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
April 19, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
April 19, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIMEComment: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; VER: F; D | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTIONComment: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND; VER: N; D | |
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISSComment: MOTION DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC; VER: F; D | |
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; VER: F; P | |
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALComment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P | |
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: ENLARGE TIME ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS; VER: F; D | |
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGComment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.