Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cole, Donald Reed, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Chris M Limberopoulos, against Synthes Spine Inc, Synthes Spine Company Lp, Synthes North America Inc, Synthes Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2005 | Docket Event | MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORTComment: INTERIM MEDIATION STATUS REPORT; VER: F; P | |
June 03, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSELComment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P | |
April 18, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATIONComment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: F; P | |
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIALComment: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL; VER: F; P | |
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALComment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P | |
March 02, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO DISTRICT COURT; VER: F; P | |
January 13, 2005 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REComment: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE: PROPOSED ORDER; VER: F; P | |
January 13, 2005 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONComment: MOTION FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME TO EFFECUTATE SERVICE; VER: F; P | |
January 13, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; VER: F; P | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIMEComment: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.