Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mckinnon, William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benjamin G Deberg, Esq, against Modtech Inc, Barber, Micah, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFFER, SUSAN F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFFER, SUSAN F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2004 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
June 09, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
June 09, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED MICAH BARBER; VER: F; K | |
March 12, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AT BRANCHComment: SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED AT BRANCH; VER: N; P | |
March 10, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO MICAH BARBER; VER: F; P | |
March 10, 2004 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALComment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P | |
March 10, 2004 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINTComment: AMENDED COMPLAINT; VER: F; P | |
March 10, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO MICAH BARBER; VER: F; P | |
February 19, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED MODTECH INC 020704; VER: F; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.