Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Savoretti, Mark, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case represented by Charles William Gerdes, against Spartan Capital Management Inc, Divot Golf Corporation, Cellura, Joseph R, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFFER, SUSAN F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFFER, SUSAN F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2004 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION; VER: F; D | |
September 10, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE; VER: N; D | |
July 30, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED JOSEPH R CELLURA 070604; VER: F; K | |
July 15, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED SPARTAN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT INC 070604; VER: F; K | |
July 01, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AT BRANCHComment: SUMMONS ISSUED AT BRANCH (4); VER: N; K | |
May 27, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGComment: ORDER GRANTING ENLARGEMENT TIME SERVE SUMMONS; VER: F; P | |
May 27, 2004 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY CLERK 060904; VER: F; P | |
May 27, 2004 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONComment: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT TIME SERVE SUMMONS; VER: F; P | |
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIMEComment: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; VER: F; P | |
January 26, 2004 | Docket Event | THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTIONComment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 011 BY 1249 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.