Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Haas And Wilkerson Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mark R Lewis, against Sutton, Frank L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLENDERMAN, JOHN C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event | MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: SUTTON FRANK L OR14316PG2682-004; VER: F; KVol./Book 14316, Page 2682, 004 pages | |
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event | MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: MASTER ORDER (03-019) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K | |
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K | |
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S)Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000Comment: SUTTON FRANK L; VER: N; K | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 050405 MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K | |
February 23, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS MAILED TO ATTORNEYComment: ALIAS SUMMONS MLD TO ATTY / FRANK L SUTTON; VER: N; K | |
February 20, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; VER: F; P | |
February 19, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTIONComment: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.