Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Haas And Wilkerson Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mark R Lewis, against Mazzarella Pizza Inc, Guerra, Michael, Jr, Guerra, Michael, Guerra, Cecelia M, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLOGAN, WALTER D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Comment: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT /ORDER OF DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER FILED W/CLERK 012105; VER: F; P | |
December 06, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING Comment: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DIMISS/MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P | |
December 03, 2004 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER FILED W/CLERK 120604; VER: F; P | |
November 22, 2004 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 112304 3:45; VER: F; P | |
November 10, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D | |
November 09, 2004 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (3); VER: F; D | |
November 04, 2004 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (3); VER: F; D | |
October 20, 2004 | Docket Event | CLERKS MOTION Comment: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AGAINST MAZARELLA PIZZA/ORDER; VER: F; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.