Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wigley, Theresa, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Angela E Outten, against Western Florida Lighting Inc, Florida Custom Engravers Inc, represented by Joshua Magidson, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED; VER: F; P | |
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOComment: SUBPOENA FOR DEPO - NOT SERVED; VER: F; P | |
July 28, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITIONComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPO SERVED; VER: F; D | |
July 09, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOComment: SUBPOENA FOR DEPO SERVED; VER: F; P | |
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL; VER: F; D | |
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: TRANSFERRING CAUSE; VER: N; D | |
June 25, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (2); VER: F; P | |
June 03, 2004 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONComment: MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ATTCHD HERETO; VER: F; P | |
March 15, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION BILL DONNATI; VER: F; P | |
February 09, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.