Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bryant, Patricia, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Joseph C Whitelock, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLENDERMAN, JOHN C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2003 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; D | |
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR14488PG1702-001; VER: F; DVol./Book 14488, Page 1702, 001 pages | |
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; D | |
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REComment: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE: PROPOSED ORDER; VER: F; D | |
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; D | |
June 21, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSELComment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; VER: F; D | |
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL --SETTLED; VER: F; P | |
April 13, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCEComment: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; D | |
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCEComment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 041405 AT 1:30; VER: F; P | |
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: STEPHANIE BOSTON; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.