Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tech Data Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gilbert M Singer, Esq, against Creative Resources Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES (EXEMPLIFIED) - MLD TO ATTY 080305; VER: N; K | |
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMETN; VER: F; P | |
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 071105; VER: F; P | |
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENTComment: AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P | |
July 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Reopen Fee Paid $Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P | |
July 05, 2005 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE MOTIONComment: EX-PARTE MOTION: AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P | |
July 05, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENEDComment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P | |
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENTComment: SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR13562PG0560-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 13562, Page 0560, 001 pages | |
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (SRS)Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.