Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rozanowski, Jeffrey, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Marcus A Castillo, against Schaeufele, Robert, represented by Debora Moss, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2003 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 3DESTROYED LETTER FILE | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUESTED COPY SENT VIA Doc # 2US MAIL ATTY GENERAL | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 1FILE DESTROYED | |
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OF ROBERT SCHAEUFELE; VER: F; P | |
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TOComment: SCHAEUFELE ROBERT; VER: N; K | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TOComment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE AS TO OR16157PG0227-001; VER: N; PVol./Book 16157, Page 0227, 001 pages | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | ID NAMEComment: ROBERT N LYNCH AND; VER: N; P | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | ID NAMEComment: DIOCESE OF ST PETERSBURG INC; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.