Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Balcomb, John, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by James R Kennedy Jr, Esq, against Ihs Of Florida No 4 Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2003 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S)Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 050405 MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000Comment: IHS OF FLORIDA NO 4 INC; VER: N; K | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE-INTENT DISMISS PER JUDGEComment: NOTICE/INTENT DISMISS PER JUDGE; VER: N; K | |
February 23, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D | |
February 04, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISSComment: MOTION DISMISS; VER: F; D | |
December 19, 2003 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P | |
December 19, 2003 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALComment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.