Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kershaw Automation Inc, Kershaw Automation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gilbert M Singer, Esq, against Vf Works Inc, represented by W Bart Meacham, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAFER, WALTER L, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event | NON-JURY TRIALComment: NON JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | UNIFORM PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERComment: UNIFORM PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; VER: F; K | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 051705; VER: F; P | |
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event | WITNESS LISTComment: WITNESS LIST /EXHIBIT LIST; VER: F; P | |
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST; VER: F; D | |
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE TRIAL-ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCEComment: NOTICE TRIAL/ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 053105 10:30; VER: F; P | |
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVINGComment: ORDER: MOTION TO STRIKE JURY TRIAL; VER: F; P | |
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 020705 9:45; VER: F; P | |
July 28, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGComment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND STYLE ETC; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.