Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Creative Coating And More Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by James A Byrne, Esq, against Western Surety Company, Commercial Interiors Corporation Of Boca Raton, represented by John Y Benford, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES/DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: F; D | |
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALComment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: F; D | |
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event | ANSWER OFComment: ANSWER OF: COMMERCIAL INTERIORS CORPORATION OF BOCA RATON; VER: N; D | |
February 19, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; D | |
February 19, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT OF ALAN SIMONS; VER: F; D | |
February 19, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE; VER: F; D | |
February 09, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCEComment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO COMMERICAL INTERIORS CORP; VER: F; D | |
February 09, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTIONComment: MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; D | |
January 30, 2004 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUEDComment: EXECUTION ISSUED TO ATTY MLD (C/C); VER: N; K | |
January 29, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: COMMERCIAL INTERIORS CORPORATION OF BOCA RATON 011504; VER: F; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.