Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vileniskis, Janina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joel M Barnett, against Rolling Frito-Lay Sales Lp, Lemaitre, Gary F, represented by Mark R Antonelli, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2003 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2004 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION /; VER: N; P | |
December 03, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
December 03, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
October 13, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED; VER: F; D | |
October 12, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED; VER: F; P | |
October 11, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED(2); VER: F; D | |
October 08, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO (2) SERVED; VER: F; D | |
October 07, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO (2) SERVED; VER: F; D | |
September 29, 2004 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATEComment: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION; VER: F; D | |
September 20, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.