Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frum, William H, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by James J Dowling, against Nationwide Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Bruce Allen Aebel, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASE, JAMES R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
June 24, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
June 24, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
March 03, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENAComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED; VER: F; P | |
February 09, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PRODUCEComment: NOTICE TO PRODUCE; VER: F; D | |
February 05, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P | |
February 05, 2004 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESComment: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; P | |
February 05, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P | |
February 02, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; D | |
February 02, 2004 | Docket Event | ANSWER OFComment: ANSWER OF: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA; VER: N; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.