Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Crump, Melissa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Crump, Brent A, in the jurisdiction of Pasco County, FL, . Pasco County, FL Superior Courts with DISKEY, DANIEL DWIGHT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDISKEY, DANIEL DWIGHT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPasco County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | BVS Electronically Reported to Vital Statistics | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE 03112021 3:00PM VIA PHONE CONFERENCE | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Of Referral To General Master Or Magistrate | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Denied BRENT A CRUMP/PARTY FILED PAPERS | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order For Temporary Standing No Child | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | BVS Electronically Reported to Vital Statistics | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 512021DR000160DRAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2021 | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Relations/Family Law Case Log | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Respondents Notice Of Social Security Number Confi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.