Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Burton, Joshua, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Name Change, in the jurisdiction of Pasco County, FL, . Pasco County, FL Superior Courts with DISKEY, DANIEL DWIGHT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDISKEY, DANIEL DWIGHT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPasco County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Name Change Form To Florida Dept Of Law Enforcement | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Form Number 427 To Bureau Of Vital Statistics Name | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Judgment OF CHANGE OF NAME | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON 031921 @230PM | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition FOR CHANGE OF NAME | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice on Petition for Change of Name | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 512021DR000144DRAXWS Filed with Clerk on 1/11/2021 | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Relations/Family Law Case Log | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.