Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Parderlikes, Mark Steven, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Puza, Crystal Dee, in the jurisdiction of Pasco County, FL, . Pasco County, FL Superior Courts with RIBA, JOSHUA B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRIBA, JOSHUA B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPasco County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | BVS Electronically Reported to Vital Statistics | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Report And Recommendation Of General Master Or Mag | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE 11042021 11:30AM CIA PHONE CONFERENCE OR ZOOM | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion FOR HEARING FILED BY PET | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Entered ON CRYSTAL DEE PUZA | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion For Default On CRYSTAL DEE PUZA | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Default for Entry by Clerk | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Mandatory Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.